ND HB1394 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsections 7 and 9 of section 19-03.1-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to marijuana possession offenses and penalties.
Title
Marijuana possession offenses and penalties.
Sponsors
Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Kathy Hawken [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-01 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 21 |
2015-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 3 0 |
2015-02-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2015-01-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |