ND 1392 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to to amend and reenact section 14-09-00.1 and subsection 1 of section 14-09-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to shared parenting time and responsibility; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Shared parenting time and responsibility; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 12 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-19SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 31
2017-04-19SenateConference committee report adopted
2017-04-19SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 70 nays 21
2017-04-19HouseConference committee report adopted
2017-04-18HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2017-04-14HouseAppoint Rep. K. Koppelman to replace Rep. Vetter on conference committee
2017-04-12SenateConference committee appointed Armstrong Myrdal Nelson
2017-04-10HouseConference committee appointed Roers Jones Vetter Hanson
2017-04-10HouseRefused to concur
2017-03-30HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 28 nays 19
2017-03-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-28SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2017-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 21
2017-02-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 15 0 0
2017-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/bill-actions/ba1392.html
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-8150-02000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-8150-02004a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-8150-03000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-8150-04000.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-8150-03004a.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/documents/17-8150-05000.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-34.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-57.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/hr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/65-2017/journals/sr-dailyjnl-71.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback