ND HB1384 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-11-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to duties of the state treasurer; to amend and reenact section 10-15-49 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to abandoned property; and to repeal section 15-02-05.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the administrator of abandoned property.
Title
The administrator of abandoned property.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Kempenich [R] | Rep. Michael Brandenburg [R] | Rep. Denton Zubke [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] |
Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 2 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 45 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-07 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 5 |
2017-01-31 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 2 1 |
2017-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |