ND 1381 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 62.1-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a restriction on firearm buyback programs; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A restriction on firearm buyback programs; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 66 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseSigned by Governor 04/08
2019-04-03HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-02SenateSigned by President
2019-03-29HouseReturned to House
2019-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 33 nays 12
2019-03-28SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 2 0
2019-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-20SenateReceived from House
2019-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 66 nays 26
2019-02-15HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 4 1
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback