ND 1378 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Veto sustained, yeas 32 nays 61
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 54-03-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to authority for the legislative assembly to conduct business in December of even-numbered years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authority for the legislative assembly to conduct business in December of even-numbered years.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - House Veto sustained, (Y: 32 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 57 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseVeto sustained, yeas 32 nays 61
2021-04-22HouseConsideration of Governor's veto
2021-04-01HouseVetoed by Governor 03/31
2021-03-26HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-24SenateSigned by President
2021-03-23HouseReturned to House
2021-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 41 nays 6
2021-03-19SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 1 0
2021-03-19SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-03-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 57 nays 36
2021-02-16HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2021-02-12HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback