ND 1378 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 30.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to supported decisionmaking, a process for making well-informed, voluntary decisions by methods less restrictive than guardianship or conservatorship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Supported decisionmaking, a process for making well-informed, voluntary decisions by methods less restrictive than guardianship or conservatorship.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20HouseSigned by Governor 03/19
2019-03-15HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-15HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-13SenateSigned by President
2019-03-11HouseReturned to House
2019-03-08SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 42 nays 0
2019-03-07SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2019-02-07SenateReceived from House
2019-02-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6
2019-02-01HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-01-31HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
2019-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2019-01-10HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback