ND 1373 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 16.1-07-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to early voting dates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early voting dates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-30SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 37
2021-03-26SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0
2021-03-19SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-03-04SenateCommittee Hearing 02:45
2021-02-16SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2021-02-09SenateReceived from House
2021-02-08HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 13
2021-02-02HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-01HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-18HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback