ND HB1352 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 24-03-23, 39-26-02, 39-26-04, 39-26-06, 39-26-07, and 39-26-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to custody and disposition of abandoned motor vehicles; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Custody and disposition of abandoned motor vehicles; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Johnson [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] |
Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Governor 04/05 |
2017-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-31 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Transportation Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 1, Emergency clause carried |
2017-02-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Rereferred to Transportation |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |