ND 1347 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 38-08-04.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the abandoned oil and gas well plugging and site reclamation fund; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a report to the legislative management.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The abandoned oil and gas well plugging and site reclamation fund; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a report to the legislative management.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12HouseSigned by Governor 04/11
2017-04-10HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-05HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-04SenateSigned by President
2017-04-03HouseReturned to House
2017-04-03SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-31SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2017-03-21SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 4
2017-02-14HouseLaid over one legislative day
2017-02-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 18 1 2
2017-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback