ND 1343 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 72
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 43-32.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the psychology interjurisdictional compact.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The psychology interjurisdictional compact.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 20 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 72
2019-01-29HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 1 2
2019-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 09:45
2019-01-09HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback