ND HB1305 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-05 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Andrist A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state water commission for water project grants; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Andrist A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the state water commission for water project grants; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-05 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-04 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-30 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-30 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 047 nays 000 | |
2009-04-30 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading passed, y 091 n 001 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-20 | Appointed O'Connell to replace Lindaas | |
2009-04-16 | Conf comm appointed Fischer Holmberg Lindaas | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Skarphol Hawken Onstad | |
2009-04-14 | Refused to concur | |
2009-04-08 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-04-08 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-08 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 001 | |
2009-04-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 001 | |
2009-03-12 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations | |
2009-02-17 | Received from House | |
2009-02-16 | Second reading passed, y 084 n 008 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 021 n 003 | |
2009-01-22 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1305.html |