ND HB1287 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact subdivision d to subsection 1 of section 19-03.1-23.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an enhanced penalty for the death of an individual as a result of a drug overdose; and to provide a penalty.
Title
An enhanced penalty for the death of an individual as a result of a drug overdose; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 40 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 03/31 |
2021-03-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-24 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-18 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 16 |
2021-02-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2021-02-08 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2021-02-04 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2021-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2021-01-11 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |