ND HB1287 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact section 39-06-14.2 and a new paragraph to subdivision? a of subsection? 3 of section 39-06.1-10 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to graduated driver licensing; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 39-06-01.1, subsection 1 of section 39-06-03, section 39-06-04, subsection 1 of section 39-06-05, sections 39-06-14 and 39-06-17, subsection 4 of section 39-06-42, subsection 2 of section 39-06-43, subdivision i of subsection 2 of section 39-06-49, and subsection 1 of section 39-06.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to drivers licenses issued to operators, restricted licenses, and class D instruction permit; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Drivers licenses issued to operators, restricted licenses, and class D instruction permit; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 25 N: 64 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 25 nays 64 |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 3 2 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |