ND 1286 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor 05/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 19-03.1-36.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to law enforcement agencies reporting seizures and forfeitures; and to amend and reenact sections 19-03.1-36.2, 19-03.1-36.6, and 19-03.1-36.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to forfeiture proceedings, contested forfeiture hearings, and legal interests in forfeited property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeiture proceedings, contested forfeiture hearings, and legal interests in forfeited property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 42 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 55 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 57 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02HouseSigned by Governor 05/01
2019-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-26SenateSigned by President
2019-04-26SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 4
2019-04-26SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-26SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-26HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 55 nays 37
2019-04-26HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-25HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-11SenateConference committee appointed D. Larson Dwyer Bakke
2019-04-11HouseConference committee appointed K. Koppelman Jones Satrom
2019-04-11HouseRefused to concur
2019-04-01HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-04-01SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1
2019-04-01SenateAmendment adopted
2019-04-01SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2019-04-01SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-29SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2019-03-26SenateCommittee Hearing 10:15
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-02-27SenateReceived from House
2019-02-20HouseMotion to reconsider laid on table
2019-02-20HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 57 nays 33
2019-02-19HouseReported back without recommendation 12 9 0
2019-02-18HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-15HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-14HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0
2019-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 08:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba1286.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0345-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0345-04011a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0345-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0345-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0345-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0345-08000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0345-09000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-33.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-57.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-76.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-76.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback