ND 1283 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 19-24.1-03.1 and a new paragraph to subdivision b of subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to access to medical marijuana; to amend and reenact section 19-24.1-01, subsection 2 of section 19-24.1-03, subdivision a of subsection 5 of section 19-24.1-05, subsection 7 of section 19-24.1-10, subsection 3 of section 19-24.1-11, and subsection 10 of section 19-24.1-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to access to medical marijuana; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to medical marijuana; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseSigned by Governor 04/23
2019-04-19HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-19HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-18SenateSigned by President
2019-04-17SenateEmergency clause carried
2019-04-17SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0
2019-04-17SenateConference committee report adopted
2019-04-16SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 6, Emergency clause carried
2019-04-16HouseConference committee report adopted
2019-04-15HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2019-04-11SenateConference committee appointed K. Roers Anderson Hogan
2019-04-08HouseConference committee appointed M. Ruby Devlin Damschen
2019-04-08HouseRefused to concur
2019-03-25HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-03-22SenateEmergency clause carried
2019-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 43 nays 0
2019-03-22SenateAmendment adopted
2019-03-22SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2019-03-21SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-03-20SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2019-03-05SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee
2019-02-19SenateReceived from House
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 3, Emergency clause carried
2019-02-14HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-13HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2
2019-01-14HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/bill-actions/ba1283.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0415-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0415-01005a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0415-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0415-03002a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0415-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0415-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0415-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/documents/19-0415-07000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-31.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-51.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/hr-dailyjnl-68.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/66-2019/journals/sr-dailyjnl-69.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback