ND 1282 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 55
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a joint committee on federal nullification; and to provide a directive.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A joint committee on federal nullification; and to provide a directive.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 38 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 51 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 38 nays 55
2021-04-19HouseConcurred
2021-04-16HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-04-01HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-31SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 32 nays 15
2021-03-31SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-30SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2021-03-30SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateReceived from House
2021-02-10HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 51 nays 43
2021-02-05HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-04HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 4 1
2021-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback