ND HB1270 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact subsection 5 of section 16.1-04-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to required consultations with political parties and legislators before establishing or altering polling places; and to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 16.1-04-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to requirements to establish or alter precinct boundaries.
Title
Requirements to establish or alter precinct boundaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 20 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 20 nays 26 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 7 |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2019-01-25 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |