ND HB1267 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to establish a legislative management redistricting committee, to provide for the implementation of a legislative redistricting plan, to exempt drafts of redistricting plans from open records requirements, and to provide for a special legislative session; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
AN ACT to establish a legislative management redistricting committee, to provide for the implementation of a legislative redistricting plan, to exempt drafts of redistricting plans from open records requirements, and to provide for a special legislative session; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/18 | |
2011-04-19 | Signed by Governor 04/18 | |
2011-04-15 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-11 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-08 | Concurred | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 | |
2011-03-22 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-18 | Received from House | |
2011-02-17 | Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 21, Emergency clause carried | |
2011-02-11 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 3 4 | |
2011-02-08 | Majority report adopted | |
2011-02-07 | Divided committee report, do pass, maj 9 min 3 | |
2011-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Political Subdivisions Committee |