ND 1257 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 58
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 20.1-08-04.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the use of scopes on muzzleloading firearms for individuals over sixty-five years of age.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The use of scopes on muzzleloading firearms for individuals over sixty-five years of age.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 35 N: 58 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 35 nays 58
2019-01-25HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1
2019-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback