ND 1257 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-09 - Filed with Secretary of State

Summary

Introduced by Sen. Nodland, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 11-09.1-05 and subsection 2 of section 40-05.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting use of home rule authority to impose higher or lower property tax rates for certain properties; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Introduced by Sen. Nodland, Wanzek A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 11-09.1-05 and subsection 2 of section 40-05.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting use of home rule authority to impose higher or lower property tax rates for certain properties; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-09 Filed with Secretary of State
2009-04-08 Signed by Governor
2009-04-07 Sent to Governor
2009-04-07 Signed by Speaker
2009-03-20 Signed by President
2009-03-10 Returned to House
2009-03-09 Second reading, passed, yeas 047 nays 000
2009-03-06 Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000
2009-03-05 Committee Hearing 09:30
2009-02-25 Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions
2009-02-11 Received from House
2009-02-10 Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 000
2009-02-06 Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 001
2009-01-29 Committee Hearing 09:30
2009-01-09 Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback