ND 1254 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Signed by Governor 04/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the types of spousal support ordered by the district court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to provide for a legislative management study of the types of spousal support ordered by the district court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 51 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 43 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Governor 04/21
2021-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-19SenateSigned by President
2021-04-15SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 6
2021-04-15SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-14SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-13HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 71 nays 23
2021-04-13HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-12HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-06SenateConference committee appointed K. Roers O. Larsen Hogan
2021-04-05HouseConference committee appointed Rohr Fegley Schneider
2021-04-05HouseRefused to concur
2021-03-29HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-26SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 4
2021-03-26SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-25SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2021-03-17SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-01-28SenateReceived from House
2021-01-27HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 51 nays 40
2021-01-27HouseReconsidered
2021-01-26HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 48
2021-01-21HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 0
2021-01-20HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1254.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0706-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0706-01006a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0706-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0706-01007a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0706-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0706-04000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-14.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-15.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-53.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-64.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-66.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback