ND HB1241 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact two new subdivisions to subsection 2 of section 57-38-30.3 and chapter 54-38.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an individual income tax deduction for contributions made to a first-time home buyer savings account; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An individual income tax deduction for contributions made to a first-time home buyer savings account; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 36 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 14 |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 3 0 |
2019-02-05 | House | Rereferred to Finance and Taxation |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |