ND HB1229 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed, lacks constitutional majority yeas 47 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Second reading, failed, lacks constitutional majority yeas 47 nays 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 11-11-35 and 16.1-15-32 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to county notification requirements.
Title
County notification requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Mary Johnson [R] | Rep. Daniel Johnston [R] |
Rep. Andrew Marschall [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 47 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | House | Second reading, failed, lacks constitutional majority yeas 47 nays 42 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 5 0 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |