ND HB1228 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 008 nays 084
Status: Introduced on January 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 008 nays 084
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Olafson, Wardner A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 53-10-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to liability for injury or damage incurred during equine activity.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Erbele, Olafson, Wardner A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 53-10-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to liability for injury or damage incurred during equine activity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-02 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 008 nays 084 | |
2009-01-28 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1228.html |