ND HB1214 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to repeal section
Title
The parenting coordinator program and elimination of the expiration date for chapter 14-09.2 of the North Dakota Century Code; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2013-03-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-15 | House | Returned to House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Human Services Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2013-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-01-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 |
2013-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |