ND HB1212 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Signed by Governor 03/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-31 - Signed by Governor 03/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 9-15.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Revised Uniform Athlete Agents Act; to repeal chapter 9-15.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Uniform Athlete Agents Act; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The Uniform Athlete Agents Act; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by Governor 03/30 |
2017-03-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-20 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2 |
2017-01-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |