ND HB1210 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a cardiac ready community grant program; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
A cardiac ready community grant program; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Bert Anderson [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Rep. Lisa Meier [R] |
Rep. Mike Nathe [R] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Sen. Bill Bowman [R] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] |
Sen. Robert Erbele [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Governor 04/05 |
2017-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-03-31 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-23 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 0 |
2017-01-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2017-01-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |