ND HB1200 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 23-29-07.12 and a new section to chapter 23.1-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting a political subdivision from regulating an auxiliary container; to amend and reenact sections 23-29-03 and 23.1-08-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of auxiliary container; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The definition of auxiliary container; to provide an effective date; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 72 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | House | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-25 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-21 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 14 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 72 nays 19 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 1 0 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |