ND 1170 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 29-31.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal forfeitures; to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 4-24-12, subsection 4 of section 5-01-16, sections 12.1-06.1-05 and 12.1-06.1-06, subsection 7 of section 12.1-23-16, subsection 4 of section 12.1-28-02, section 19-03.1-36, subsection 1 of section 27-20-03, sections 39-03-18, 39-08-01.3, 39-30-04, 40-11-13, 54-12-14, and 57-36-14, subsection 2 of section 57-36-33, section 62.1-01-02, and subsection 2 of section 62.1-05-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to forfeiture remedies, forfeiture of property, forfeiture funds of motor vehicles, forfeitures for violation of ordinances, seizure procedures, and forfeiture procedures; and to repeal sections 19-03.1-36.1, 19-03.1-36.2, 19-03.1-36.3, 19-03.1-36.4, 19-03.1-36.5, 19-03.1-36.6, 19-03.1-36.7, and 28-01-20, and chapters 29-31.1 and 32-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to forfeiture proceedings, forfeiture disposition, seizure and transfer of forfeitable property, and actions to recover forfeitures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Forfeiture proceedings, forfeiture disposition, seizure and transfer of forfeitable property, and actions to recover forfeitures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 50 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 46
2017-03-29SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-21SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 50 nays 42
2017-02-16HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 4 0
2017-01-30HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-01-06HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback