ND HB1162 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of competition between government and private industry.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of competition between government and private industry.
Sponsors
Rep. Nathan Toman [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Christopher Olson [R] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 5 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 5 nays 41 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 8 |
2017-01-27 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-26 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2017-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |