ND HB1145 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 4.1-11-02 and 4.1-11-03, and subsection 2 of section 4.1-11-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to soybean districts and terms of office for members elected to the North Dakota soybean council.
Title
Soybean districts and terms of office for members elected to the North Dakota soybean council.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Mike Beltz [R] | Rep. Jared Hagert [R] | Rep. Michael Howe [R] |
Sen. Randy Lemm [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Merrill Piepkorn [D] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Sen. Mark Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2021-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2021-03-30 | House | Concurred |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2021-01-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-01-15 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |