ND HB1144 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 49-22-08.2 and chapter 49-22.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to gas and liquid energy conversion, gas and liquid transmission facility siting, and combining application; to amend and reenact sections 11-09.1-04, 17-05-09, and 32-15-21, subsection 18 of section 38-08-02, sections 49-07-01.1, 49-22-03, 49-22-04, 49-22-05.1, 49-22-07, and 49-22-07.2, subsection 1 of section 49-22-08, sections 49-22-08.1, 49-22-09, 49-22-09.1, 49-22-14, 49-22-16, 49-22-17, 49-22-19, 49-22-20, and 49-22-21, subdivision e of subsection 1 of section 49-22-22, subsection 2 of section 49-22-22, subsection 1 of section 54-17.7-08, and section 61-24.3-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to energy conversion and transmission facility siting; to repeal sections 49-22-01 and 49-22-16.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to energy conversion short title and route adjustment before or during construction for gas or liquid transmission line; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Energy conversion short title and route adjustment before or during construction for gas or liquid transmission line; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. George Keiser [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Jay Seibel [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] |
Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/10 |
2017-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2017-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-23 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-01-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-01-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |