ND HB1142 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 26.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to interpretation of the state's insurance laws.
Title
Interpretation of the state's insurance laws.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2019-03-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-13 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-11 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2019-02-06 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-01-31 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |