ND HB1135 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsections 9 and 10 of section 39-01-15 and section 39-04-10.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to parking spaces for the mobility impaired; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Parking spaces for the mobility impaired; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | Signed by Governor 03/21 |
2019-03-19 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-15 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 1 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 5 |
2019-02-18 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 4 0 |
2019-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |