ND HB1131 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Signed by Governor 03/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 37-19.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the employment preference for veterans.
Title
The employment preference for veterans.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Schatz [R] | Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Wesley Belter [R] |
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Kelly Armstrong [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 26 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Signed by Governor 03/16 |
2015-03-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-13 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-10 | House | Returned to House |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 26 nays 21 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Laid over one legislative day |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 5 2 0 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2015-01-27 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 2 |
2015-01-23 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2015-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2015-01-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |