ND HB1122 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-21-02.4, 15.1-21-02.5, 15.1-21-02.6, and 15.1-21-02.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility for the North Dakota career and technical education scholarship and the North Dakota academic scholarship for high school students enrolled in dual-credit or early entry courses.
Title
Eligibility for the North Dakota career and technical education scholarship and the North Dakota academic scholarship for high school students enrolled in dual-credit or early entry courses.
Sponsors
Rep. Brandy Pyle [R] | Rep. Jeff Hoverson [R] | Rep. Michael Howe [R] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] | Rep. Shannon Roers Jones [R] | Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-04 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-02-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 5 |
2019-02-08 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 2 0 |
2019-01-30 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-01-30 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-01-29 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |