ND 1108 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 62
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 11-11-37 and 40-01-09.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notification requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Notification requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 31 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-01HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 31 nays 62
2021-01-26HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-25HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
2021-01-14HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback