ND HB1086 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-19-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notifications regarding student use of alcohol or controlled substances.
Title
Notifications regarding student use of alcohol or controlled substances.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/10 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-27 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-06 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-04 | Returned to House | |
2011-04-01 | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 | |
2011-03-30 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-03-30 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee | |
2011-01-13 | Received from House | |
2011-01-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0 | |
2011-01-11 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 | |
2011-01-11 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |