ND HB1081 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 4.1-19-01 and section 4.1-19-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition and sale of eggs.
Title
The definition and sale of eggs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | House | Signed by Governor 03/08 |
2019-03-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-02-28 | House | Returned to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2019-01-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-04 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |