ND HB1066 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-09 - Signed by Governor 03/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 50-06-05.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the accreditation of the regional human service centers.
Title
The accreditation of the regional human service centers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Signed by Governor 03/09 |
2021-03-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-04 | House | Returned to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-01-14 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2021-01-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-01-12 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |