ND 1035 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact chapters 27-20.2, 27-20.3, and 27-20.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Juvenile Court Act; to amend and reenact subsection 16 of section 11-16-01, section 12.1-32-15, subsections 1 and 3 of section 12.1-41-12, subsection 2 of section 14-02.1-03.1, subsection 2 of section 14-02.1-08, subdivision c of subsection 2 of section 14-07.1-18, section 14-15-11, subsections 1 and 2 of section 15.1-09-33.4, sections 15.1-19-15, 20.1-13.1-01, 20.1-15-01, 26.1-36-20, and 26.1-40-11.1, subsection 2 of section 27-05-30, section 27-20.1-01, paragraph 4 of subdivision n of subsection 2 of section 27-20.1-06, subsection 1 of section 27-20.1-10, subdivision d of subsection 1 of section 27-20.1-11, subsection 3 of section 27-20.1-11, subsection 2 of section 27-20.1-17, section 27-20.1-22, section 27-20.3-05 as created by section 23 of this Act, section 27-20.4-06 as created by section 25 of this Act, subsections 2 and 3 of section 27-21-02, subsection 3 of section 27-21-02.1, section 27-21-09, subsections 2 and 5 of section 27-21-12, section 30.1-27-02, subsection 3 of section 30.1-27-06, section 39-06-32.1, subsection 2 of section 39-20-01, section 39-24.1-01, subsection 5 of section 50-06-05.1, subdivision a of subsection 4 of section 50-06-43.2, subsection 1 of section 50-11.3-01, sections 50-25.1-02 and 50-25.1-06, subsection 4 of section 50-25.1-15, subsection 2 of section 54-12-34, and sections 54-23.4-17 and 62.1-02-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to juvenile justice; to repeal chapter 27-20 and section 27-21-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Uniform Juvenile Court Act; to provide a penalty; to provide an appropriation; to provide a legislative management report; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Uniform Juvenile Court Act; to provide a penalty; to provide an appropriation; to provide a legislative management report; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29HouseSigned by Governor 04/28
2021-04-26HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-26HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-26SenateSigned by President
2021-04-23SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2
2021-04-23SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-22SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 5
2021-04-22HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-22HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-19SenateAppoint Sen. Hogue to replace Sen. Heitkamp on conference committee
2021-04-13SenateConference committee appointed Larson Heitkamp Bakke
2021-04-12HouseConference committee appointed Meier Bellew Kempenich
2021-04-12HouseRefused to concur
2021-04-06HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-06SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 2
2021-04-06SenateAmendment failed
2021-04-06SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-04-06SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-05SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0
2021-03-31SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-03-25SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2021-03-25SenateAmendment adopted
2021-03-24SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 1
2021-03-23SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-03-23SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-16SenateReceived from House
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 4
2021-02-05HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 21 0 0
2021-02-03HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2021-02-03HouseAmendment adopted
2021-02-02HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 1
2021-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1035.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0150-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0150-03003a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0150-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0150-04001a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0150-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0150-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0150-07000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0150-08000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-28.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-59.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-72.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback