ND 1032 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Signed by Governor 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new chapter to title 26.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prescription drug cost transparency; to amend and reenact section 43-15.3-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to wholesale drug license fees; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wholesale drug license fees; to provide a continuing appropriation; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 63 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-28HouseSigned by Governor 04/27
2021-04-22HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-20SenateSigned by President
2021-04-16HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 23
2021-04-16HouseConcurred
2021-04-12HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 38 nays 9
2021-04-12SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-04-09SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 1 1
2021-04-08SenateRereferred to Human Services
2021-04-08SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2021-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 10:30
2021-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2021-02-22SenateReceived from House
2021-02-19HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 63 nays 29
2021-02-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-17HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0
2021-01-06HouseCommittee Hearing 01:30
2021-01-05HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback