ND HB1015 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide for a report to the budget section; to provide for borrowing authority; and to provide legislative intent.
Title
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the department of corrections and rehabilitation; to provide for a report to the budget section; to provide for borrowing authority; and to provide legislative intent.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Filed with Secretary Of State 05/09 | |
2011-05-20 | Signed by Governor 05/09 | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-28 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-27 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2011-04-26 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-26 | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-08 | Conference committee appointed Christmann Wanzek O'Connell | |
2011-04-08 | Refused to concur | |
2011-04-06 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-04-06 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-03-04 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee | |
2011-02-24 | Received from House | |
2011-02-24 | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4 | |
2011-02-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1 | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-21 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-20 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-18 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-17 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-12 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-11 | Committee Hearing 08:30 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |