ND HB1001 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor 04/30
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the office of the governor; to amend and reenact sections 54-07-04 and 54-08-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the salaries of the governor and lieutenant governor; to repeal section 3 of chapter 26 of the 2019 Session Laws, relating to the appropriation of additional income to the office of the governor; to provide an exemption; to provide for a report; and to declare an emergency.
Title
The appropriation of additional income to the office of the governor; to provide an exemption; to provide for a report; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Second reading (Y: 83 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Signed by Governor 04/30 |
2021-04-29 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 83 nays 3, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-28 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Hogue Sorvaag Mathern |
2021-04-12 | House | Conference committee appointed Martinson Schatz Boe |
2021-04-12 | House | Refused to concur |
2021-04-01 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-22 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 84 nays 9, Emergency clause carried |
2021-02-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 1 |
2021-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2021-01-05 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |