MS HC55 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commemorating The Esteemed And Laudable Career And Public Service Of Former Representative Michael Weston Janus, And Expressing The Sympathy Of The Legislature Upon His Passing.
Title
Former Representative Michael Weston Janus; commend laudable career and public service of upon his passing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-03-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-23 | House | Referred To Rules |