MN SF86 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Secretary of State, Filed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Automated license plate reader data classification, use of log and destruction of data requirements
Title
Automated license plate reader data classification, use of log and destruction of data requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Latz [D] | Sen. Susan Kent [D] | Sen. Dan Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third reading (Y: 55 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 96 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 87 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to lay bill on the table (Y: 19 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Repassage (Y: 96 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-17 - House - House: Adoption (Y: 87 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-15 - Senate - Senate: Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested (Y: 45 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Motion did not prevail to lay bill on the table (Y: 19 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 41 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2015-05-23 | Governor approval | |
2015-05-23 | Secretary of State Chapter 67 | |
2015-05-23 | Governor's action Approval | |
2015-05-20 | Presented to Governor | |
2015-05-17 | House | Bill was repassed as amended by Conference vote: 96-35 |
2015-05-17 | House | Third reading as amended by Conference |
2015-05-17 | House | House adopted conference committee report vote: 87-43 |
2015-05-17 | House | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2015-05-17 | House | Senate adopted conference committee report, bill repassed vote: 55-11 |
2015-05-17 | Senate | House adopted SCC report and repassed bill |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Third reading vote: 55-11 |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Senate adopted CC report and repassed bill |
2015-05-17 | Senate | Conference committee report, delete everything |
2015-05-16 | Senate | House conferees Cornish; Scott; Schoen |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate conferees Latz; Kent; Hall |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Senate not concur, conference committee of 3 requested vote: 45-18 |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Returned from House with amendment |
2015-05-15 | House | House conferees Cornish, Scott, and Schoen. |
2015-05-15 | House | House accedes, conference committee of 3 to be appointed |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate conferees Latz, Kent, Hall |
2015-05-15 | House | Senate refuses to concur, conference committee of 3 requested |
2015-05-14 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 126-3 |
2015-05-14 | House | Third reading as amended |
2015-05-14 | House | Amended |
2015-05-12 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, May 14, 2015 |
2015-05-11 | House | Second reading |
2015-05-11 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2015-05-08 | House | Senate file first reading, referred for comparison HF222 |
2015-05-08 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 41-19 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Motion did not prevail to lay bill on the table |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Special Order: Amended |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Second reading |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Comm report: To pass |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Transportation and Public Safety |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Comm report: Amend previous comm report |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Rule 21, referred to Rules and Administration |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Comm report: To pass as amended |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
Same As/Similar To
HF222 (Similar To) 2015-05-11 - HF indefinitely postponed