MN HF333 | 2015-2016 | 89th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-3)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Author stricken Anzelc.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Legislative approval of a state plan to comply with federal regulations regarding emissions from existing power plants required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legislative approval of a state plan to comply with federal regulations regarding emissions from existing power plants required.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-10 - House of Representatives - House: Recall and Re-refer (Y: 55 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-14HouseAuthor stricken Anzelc.
2016-04-11HouseAuthor stricken Sundin.
2016-03-31HouseAuthor stricken Metsa.
2016-03-29HouseAuthor stricken Persell.
2016-03-23HouseSecond reading
2016-03-23HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2016-03-08HouseAuthor stricken Lien.
2015-03-10HouseMotion did not prevail vote: 55-73
2015-03-10HouseMotion to recall and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Finance
2015-03-10HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2015-02-19HouseAuthor stricken Simonson.
2015-01-29HouseAuthor added Nornes.
2015-01-26HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Job Growth and Energy Affordability Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF231 (Similar To) 2015-01-21 - Referred to Environment and Energy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback