MI HB4485 | 2013-2014 | 97th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-31 - Vetoed By The Governor 01/14/2015 2014 Addenda
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Occupations; insurance; sale of insurance for self-service storage units; eliminate license requirement. Amends sec. 1202 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1202).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupations; insurance; sale of insurance for self-service storage units; eliminate license requirement. Amends sec. 1202 of 1956 PA 218 (MCL 500.1202).

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-18 - House Third Reading: Roll Call # 767 (Y: 57 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-17 - Senate Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 855 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-12-10 - Reported Favorably With Substitute S-1 (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-07 - House Third Reading: Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 387 (Y: 58 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-10-01 - Reported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3 (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-12-31HouseVetoed By The Governor 01/14/2015 2014 Addenda
2014-12-31HousePresented To The Governor 1/5/2015 @ 3:34 Pm 2014 Addenda
2014-12-18HouseBill Ordered Enrolled
2014-12-18HouseTitle Amendment Agreed To
2014-12-18House Roll Call # 767 Yeas 57 Nays 53
2014-12-18HouseSenate Substitute S-1 Concurred In
2014-12-17HouseLaid Over One Day Under The Rules
2014-12-17HouseReturned From Senate With Substitute S-1 With Immediate Effect And Title Amendment
2014-12-17SenateInserted Full Title
2014-12-17SenatePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 855 Yeas 34 Nays 3 Excused 1 Not Voting 0
2014-12-17SenatePlaced On Immediate Passage
2014-12-17SenateRules Suspended
2014-12-17SenatePlaced On Order Of Third Reading With Substitute S-1
2014-12-17SenateSubstitute S-1 Concurred In
2014-12-17SenateReported By Committee Of The Whole Favorably With Substitute S-1
2014-12-10SenateReferred To Committee Of The Whole With Substitute S-1
2014-12-10SenateCommittee Recommended Immediate Effect
2014-12-10SenateReported Favorably With Substitute S-1
2013-11-12SenateReferred To Committee On Insurance
2013-11-07HouseTransmitted
2013-11-07HousePassed; Given Immediate Effect Roll Call # 387 Yeas 58 Nays 51
2013-11-07HouseRead A Third Time
2013-11-06HousePlaced On Third Reading
2013-11-06HouseSubstitute H-3 Adopted And Amended
2013-11-06HouseRead A Second Time
2013-10-01HouseReferred To Second Reading
2013-10-01HouseReported With Recommendation With Substitute H-3
2013-03-21HousePrinted Bill Filed 03/20/2013
2013-03-20HouseReferred To Committee On Regulatory Reform
2013-03-20HouseRead A First Time
2013-03-20HouseIntroduced By Representative Bruce Rendon

Subjects


Michigan State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.mi.gov/doc.aspx?2013-HB-4485
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billintroduced/House/htm/2013-HIB-4485.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2013-HEBH-4485.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billengrossed/House/htm/2013-HEBS-4485.htm
Texthttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/billenrolled/House/htm/2013-HNB-4485.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2013-HJ-10-01-080.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2013-HJ-11-07-097.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-12-10-079.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/Senate/htm/2014-SJ-12-17-083.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legislature.mi.gov/documents/2013-2014/Journal/House/htm/2014-HJ-12-18-086.htm

Bill Comments

feedback