ME LD220 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on June 1 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-05-10 - CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Support Maine's Farmers in the Development of Sustainable Irrigation
Title
An Act to Support Maine's Farmers in the Development of Sustainable Irrigation
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Guerrette [R] | Rep. Roger Albert [R] | Rep. Donald Ardell [R] | Rep. Mark Babin [R] |
Rep. Dean Cray [R] | Rep. Randall Hall [R] | Rep. Caldwell Jackson [R] | Rep. Austin Theriault [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-10 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1482. |
2023-07-26 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 847. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROTUNDO of Androscoggin PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-224), in concurrence. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-224) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2023-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-30 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-224). |
2023-05-30 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2023-05-30 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2023-05-24 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Voted: OTP-AM |
2023-05-22 | Joint | Work Session Reconsidered |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-04-19 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-04-12 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-01-24 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY in concurrence |
2023-01-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY. |
2023-01-24 | House | Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry suggested and ordered printed. |