ME LD1931 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Foster Stable and Affordable Home Ownership in Mobile Home Parks by Amending the Laws Relating to the Sale of Mobile Home Parks
Title
An Act to Foster Stable and Affordable Home Ownership in Mobile Home Parks by Amending the Laws Relating to the Sale of Mobile Home Parks
Sponsors
Rep. Traci Gere [D] | Rep. Mana Abdi [D] | Rep. Daniel Ankeles [D] | Sen. James Dill [D] |
Rep. Victoria Doudera [D] | Rep. Christopher Kessler [D] | Rep. Laurie Osher [D] | Rep. Morgan Rielly [D] |
Rep. Laura Supica [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-14 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought To Pass As Amended Report RC #339 (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #221 (Y: 81 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #221 (Y: 81 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2023-06-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-16 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-527) in concurrence |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-527) READ and ADOPTED |
2023-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 339 Yeas 22 - Nays 13 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator PIERCE of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2023-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-527). |
2023-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2023-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-527) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2023-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2023-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 221 (Yeas 81 - Nays 67 - Absent 2 - Excused 1) |
2023-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative GERE of Kennebunkport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-06-13 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-05-26 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-05-18 | Senate | On motion by Senator Pierce of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on Housing, in concurrence. |
2023-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-05-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Joint Select Committee on HOUSING. |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |